Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Calvert County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0622
Title
Criminal Law - Trespass - Refusal or Failure to Leave Public Building or Grounds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0623 /CH0096
Title
Calvert County - Local Debt Bonding Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1258 /CH0099
Title
Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Death Benefits (Patricia Ann "Pat" Osburn Law)
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0622 Criminal Law - Trespass - Refusal or Failure to Leave Public Building or Grounds By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0623 /CH0096 Calvert County - Local Debt Bonding Authority By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Appropriations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1258 /CH0099 Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Death Benefits (Patricia Ann "Pat" Osburn Law) By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Appropriations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM