Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Calvert County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0457
Title
Calvert County - Local Forest Conservation Fund - Administrative Costs
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0458 /CH0056 (HB0802)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0511
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Fines
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0729 /CH0310
Title
Calvert County - County Commissioners - Method of Election
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1004 /CH0337
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0457 Calvert County - Local Forest Conservation Fund - Administrative Costs By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0458 /CH0056 (HB0802) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0511 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Fines By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0729 /CH0310 Calvert County - County Commissioners - Method of Election By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0737 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1004 /CH0337 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM