Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Calvert County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0168 /CH0043 (HB1184)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0339
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0340 /CH0292
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Unlicensed Establishments - Prohibitions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0341 /CH0486
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0495 /CH0512
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Premises Inspections and Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0513
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Organizational Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0548 /CH0521
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event (Festival) Beer, Wine and Liquor Permit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0611
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event (Charity) Beer, Wine and Liquor License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0612 /CH0310
Title
Calvert County - Salaries of County Officials and County Commissioner Retirement Plan Participation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0673
Title
Calvert County - Discharge of a Firearm Near Buildings
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0168 /CH0043 (HB1184) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0339 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0340 /CH0292 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Unlicensed Establishments - Prohibitions By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0341 /CH0486 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0495 /CH0512 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Premises Inspections and Penalties By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0496 /CH0513 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Organizational Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0548 /CH0521 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event (Festival) Beer, Wine and Liquor Permit By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0611 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event (Charity) Beer, Wine and Liquor License By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0612 /CH0310 Calvert County - Salaries of County Officials and County Commissioner Retirement Plan Participation By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0673 Calvert County - Discharge of a Firearm Near Buildings By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM