Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Calvert County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0229
Title
Calvert County - Sale or Distribution of Tobacco and Related Products - Civil Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0230 /CH0154 (HB0167)
Title
Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Recipient Benefits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0231
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Beer and Wine Festival License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 /CH0334
Title
Calvert County - Electronic Bingo and Electronic Tip Jars - Distribution of Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0359
Title
Calvert County - Contracts and Purchasing - Bidding Process
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360 /CH0162
Title
Calvert County - Budget Hearings and Procedures
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0361
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bottle Clubs
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0362 /CH0027 (HB0902)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0229 Calvert County - Sale or Distribution of Tobacco and Related Products - Civil Penalties By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0230 /CH0154 (HB0167) Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Recipient Benefits By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0231 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Beer and Wine Festival License By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0265 /CH0334 Calvert County - Electronic Bingo and Electronic Tip Jars - Distribution of Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0359 Calvert County - Contracts and Purchasing - Bidding Process By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0360 /CH0162 Calvert County - Budget Hearings and Procedures By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0361 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bottle Clubs By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0362 /CH0027 (HB0902) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM