Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Caroline County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 /CH0821 (HB0554/CH0820)
Title
Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1072 /CH0243 (HB1422/CH0242)
Title
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1251 /CH0069
Title
Property Tax - Municipal Corporations - Electricity Generation Facilities - Negotiated Payments in Lieu of Taxes
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0436 /CH0821 (HB0554/CH0820) Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1072 /CH0243 (HB1422/CH0242) Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1251 /CH0069 Property Tax - Municipal Corporations - Electricity Generation Facilities - Negotiated Payments in Lieu of Taxes By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2018 - 1:45 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM