Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Carroll County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0298
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Farmers' Markets
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0305 /CH0469 (SB0429/CH0468)
Title
Carroll County - Budgeting and Finance Procedures - Surplus Funds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0307
Title
Carroll County - Maintenance of Effort - Adjustment for Decreasing Student Enrollment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0310 (SB0430)
Title
Carroll County - Gaming
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0319 /CH0467 (SB0428/CH0466)
Title
Carroll County - Board of Education - Nonvoting Student Representative
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543 /CH0618
Title
Carroll County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0846 (SB0588/CH0063)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0298 Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Farmers' Markets By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0305 /CH0469 (SB0429/CH0468) Carroll County - Budgeting and Finance Procedures - Surplus Funds By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0307 Carroll County - Maintenance of Effort - Adjustment for Decreasing Student Enrollment By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0310 (SB0430) Carroll County - Gaming By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0319 /CH0467 (SB0428/CH0466) Carroll County - Board of Education - Nonvoting Student Representative By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0543 /CH0618 Carroll County - Deer Hunting - Sundays By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0846 (SB0588/CH0063) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM