Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Carroll County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0169 (SB0219/CH0180)
Title
Carroll County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0176 (SB0298)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - The Arc of Carroll County Building Renovation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0194 (SB0195/CH0053)
Title
Carroll County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0205 /CH0254 (SB0296)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737 /CH0275 (SB0677)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Beginning Hour of Sale
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0791 /CH0120 (SB0746)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0894 (SB0952)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Sykesville Freedom District Fire Department
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1147 /CH0301
Title
Carroll County - Board of Education Members - Term Limitation and Referendum
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1525
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Carroll County - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1640 (SB1167)
Title
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0169 (SB0219/CH0180) Carroll County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0176 (SB0298) Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - The Arc of Carroll County Building Renovation By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 10:00 AM
HB0194 (SB0195/CH0053) Carroll County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0205 /CH0254 (SB0296) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Appropriations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0737 /CH0275 (SB0677) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Beginning Hour of Sale By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0791 /CH0120 (SB0746) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0894 (SB0952) Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Sykesville Freedom District Fire Department By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 10:00 AM
HB1147 /CH0301 Carroll County - Board of Education Members - Term Limitation and Referendum By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Ways and Means
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1525 Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Carroll County - Warrant Intercept Program By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1640 (SB1167) Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM