Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Carroll County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0609 /CH0089 (SB0360)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0610 /CH0266 (SB0275/CH0267)
Title
Carroll County - Gaming - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0612 (SB0272)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Carroll County Veterans Independence Project
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0621 /CH0265 (SB0359/CH0264)
Title
Carroll County - Board of Education - Student Representative
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0632 /CH0262 (SB0276/CH0263)
Title
Carroll County - Unlicensed Junk Vehicles and Parts - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0641 (SB0274)
Title
Carroll County - Coin Operated Games - Repeal of Licensing Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0696 /CH0271 (SB0601/CH0270)
Title
Carroll County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0884 (SB0273)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Gamber and Community Fire Company Carnival Grounds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0984 /CH0268 (SB0542/CH0269)
Title
Carroll County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1000 (SB0437)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Boys and Girls Club of Westminster
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1116 /CH0493 (SB1152)
Title
Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0609 /CH0089 (SB0360) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0610 /CH0266 (SB0275/CH0267) Carroll County - Gaming - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Ways and Means
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0612 (SB0272) Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Carroll County Veterans Independence Project By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
HB0621 /CH0265 (SB0359/CH0264) Carroll County - Board of Education - Student Representative By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 265
Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0632 /CH0262 (SB0276/CH0263) Carroll County - Unlicensed Junk Vehicles and Parts - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0641 (SB0274) Carroll County - Coin Operated Games - Repeal of Licensing Requirements By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0696 /CH0271 (SB0601/CH0270) Carroll County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0884 (SB0273) Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Gamber and Community Fire Company Carnival Grounds By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
HB0984 /CH0268 (SB0542/CH0269) Carroll County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1000 (SB0437) Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Boys and Girls Club of Westminster By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
HB1116 /CH0493 (SB1152) Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM