Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Carroll County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0572 /CH0667 (SB0297/CH0668)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BC Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574 (SB0376/CH0184)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575 /CH0185 (SB0258/CH0186)
Title
Carroll County - Gaming Events - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0576 /CH0669 (SB0298/CH0670)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Required Information on Application
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0613 /CH0671 (SB0256/CH0672)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer and Wine Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0572 /CH0667 (SB0297/CH0668) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BC Beer, Wine, and Liquor License By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 667
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0574 (SB0376/CH0184) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0575 /CH0185 (SB0258/CH0186) Carroll County - Gaming Events - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Ways and Means
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0576 /CH0669 (SB0298/CH0670) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Required Information on Application By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0613 /CH0671 (SB0256/CH0672) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer and Wine Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 671
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM