Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Carroll County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0428 /CH0466 (HB0319/CH0467)
Title
Carroll County - Board of Education - Nonvoting Student Representative
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0429 /CH0468 (HB0305/CH0469)
Title
Carroll County - Budgeting and Finance Procedures - Surplus Funds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0430 (HB0310)
Title
Carroll County - Gaming
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0588 /CH0063 (HB0846)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0637
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0848
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0428 /CH0466 (HB0319/CH0467) Carroll County - Board of Education - Nonvoting Student Representative By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0429 /CH0468 (HB0305/CH0469) Carroll County - Budgeting and Finance Procedures - Surplus Funds By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0430 (HB0310) Carroll County - Gaming By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0588 /CH0063 (HB0846) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0637 Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0848 Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM