Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Carroll County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004 /CH0142
Title
Carroll County - Gaming Events
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0034 (HB0116)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - The Arc of Carroll County Building Renovation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0663 (HB0296/CH0084)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0004 /CH0142 Carroll County - Gaming Events By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Budget and Taxation
1/15/2015 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0034 (HB0116) Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - The Arc of Carroll County Building Renovation By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2015 - 10:30 AM
SB0663 (HB0296/CH0084) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM