Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cecil County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246 /CH0576 (SB0716/CH0575)
Title
Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil County
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0247
Title
Cecil County - Community Adult Rehabilitation Center - Appointment and Removal of Assistant Director
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0761 (SB0733)
Title
Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0767 (SB0714)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - YMCA of Cecil County Outdoor Pool
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0815 /CH0497 (SB1116)
Title
Horse Racing - Fair Hill - Arabian Breed Racing Authorization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816 /CH0632
Title
Cecil County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0824
Title
Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Traveling Expense Allowance and Pension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0832 /CH0125 (SB0715)
Title
Cecil County - Marriage Licenses - Applications
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0835 /CH0569 (SB0631/CH0568)
Title
Local Facility Closure Reserve Funds - Investments and Reinvestments
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1071 /CH0455 (SB0958/CH0454)
Title
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0246 /CH0576 (SB0716/CH0575) Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil County By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 576
Judiciary
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0247 Cecil County - Community Adult Rehabilitation Center - Appointment and Removal of Assistant Director By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0761 (SB0733) Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0767 (SB0714) Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - YMCA of Cecil County Outdoor Pool By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0815 /CH0497 (SB1116) Horse Racing - Fair Hill - Arabian Breed Racing Authorization By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Ways and Means
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0816 /CH0632 Cecil County - Sheriff - Salary By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 632
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0824 Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Traveling Expense Allowance and Pension By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0832 /CH0125 (SB0715) Cecil County - Marriage Licenses - Applications By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0835 /CH0569 (SB0631/CH0568) Local Facility Closure Reserve Funds - Investments and Reinvestments By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 569
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1071 /CH0455 (SB0958/CH0454) Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM