Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cecil County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0621
Title
Cecil County Board of Education - Members - Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0629 /CH0079 (SB0211/CH0078)
Title
Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Travel Expense Allowance
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0662
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Fair Hill
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0977 (SB0708)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Fair Hill Race Course
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1201 /CH0312 (SB0816/CH0313)
Title
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1547 (SB0817/CH0531)
Title
Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0621 Cecil County Board of Education - Members - Salary By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0629 /CH0079 (SB0211/CH0078) Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Travel Expense Allowance By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0662 Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Fair Hill By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0977 (SB0708) Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Fair Hill Race Course By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 4:00 PM
HB1201 /CH0312 (SB0816/CH0313) Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1547 (SB0817/CH0531) Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM