Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cecil County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284 /CH0607 (SB0636)
Title
Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective Bargaining
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0373 /CH0608
Title
Cecil County - Home Detention and Release Programs
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0379 (SB1132)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Bee Hive Colonial Village
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0411 /CH0068 (SB1057/CH0067)
Title
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0849 (SB1133)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Perryville Railroad Monument Sign
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0284 /CH0607 (SB0636) Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective Bargaining By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607
Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0373 /CH0608 Cecil County - Home Detention and Release Programs By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0379 (SB1132) Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Bee Hive Colonial Village By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0411 /CH0068 (SB1057/CH0067) Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness Program By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0849 (SB1133) Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Perryville Railroad Monument Sign By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM