Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cecil County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0080 /CH0339 (SB0132)
Title
Horse Racing at Fair Hill - Union Hospital Allocation - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242 /CH0171
Title
Cecil County - Natural Resources - Hunting
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540 (SB0511/CH0172)
Title
Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0997 /CH0709 (SB0259/CH0710)
Title
Cecil County – Special Taxing Districts – Internet Service
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0080 /CH0339 (SB0132) Horse Racing at Fair Hill - Union Hospital Allocation - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Ways and Means
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0242 /CH0171 Cecil County - Natural Resources - Hunting By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0540 (SB0511/CH0172) Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0997 /CH0709 (SB0259/CH0710) Cecil County – Special Taxing Districts – Internet Service By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 709
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM