Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cecil County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392 /CH0253
Title
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1011 (HB1171/CH0672)
Title
Cecil County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1012 (HB1424)
Title
Alcohol and Drug Abuse Administration - Opioid Maintenance Therapy Program - Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0392 /CH0253 Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1011 (HB1171/CH0672) Cecil County - School Buses - Length of Operation By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1012 (HB1424) Alcohol and Drug Abuse Administration - Opioid Maintenance Therapy Program - Requirements By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM