Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cecil County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0243 /CH0047
Title
Cecil County - Board of Elections - Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0936 /CH0206
Title
Cecil County - Sheriff and Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0243 /CH0047 Cecil County - Board of Elections - Membership By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0936 /CH0206 Cecil County - Sheriff and Orphans' Court Judges - Salary By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM