Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cecil County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0636 (HB0284/CH0607)
Title
Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective Bargaining
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0637
Title
Correctional Services - Cecil County - Release and Home Detention Programs
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1057 /CH0067 (HB0411/CH0068)
Title
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1132 (HB0379)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Bee Hive Colonial Village
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1133 (HB0849)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Perryville Railroad Monument Sign
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0636 (HB0284/CH0607) Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective Bargaining By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0637 Correctional Services - Cecil County - Release and Home Detention Programs By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1057 /CH0067 (HB0411/CH0068) Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness Program By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1132 (HB0379) Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Bee Hive Colonial Village By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
SB1133 (HB0849) Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Perryville Railroad Monument Sign By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM