Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cecil County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0132 (HB0080/CH0339)
Title
Horse Racing at Fair Hill - Union Hospital Allocation - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0259 /CH0710 (HB0997/CH0709)
Title
Cecil County – Special Taxing Districts – Internet Service
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0511 /CH0172 (HB0540)
Title
Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0132 (HB0080/CH0339) Horse Racing at Fair Hill - Union Hospital Allocation - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0259 /CH0710 (HB0997/CH0709) Cecil County – Special Taxing Districts – Internet Service By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 710
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2019 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0511 /CH0172 (HB0540) Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Finance
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM