Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Charles County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 /CH0085
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages Licensees - Nonalcoholic Items - Hours of Sale
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173
Title
Vehicle Laws - Charles County - Golf Cart Zones
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653 /CH0631
Title
Charles County - Building Code - Abatement of Violations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0995 (SB0868)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Children's Aid Society Building Addition
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0997 (SB0867)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Melwood Recreation Center
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0172 /CH0085 Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages Licensees - Nonalcoholic Items - Hours of Sale By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0173 Vehicle Laws - Charles County - Golf Cart Zones By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0653 /CH0631 Charles County - Building Code - Abatement of Violations By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0995 (SB0868) Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Children's Aid Society Building Addition By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0997 (SB0867) Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Melwood Recreation Center By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM