Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Charles County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0209 (SB0203/CH0279)
Title
Charles County - Board of Education - Salaries and Expenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0248 /CH0219
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0300 /CH0095
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344 /CH0395 (SB0344)
Title
Charles County - Sunday Car Sales Blue Law Exemption - Enabling Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0419 /CH0402
Title
Charles County - Off-Sale Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Population Quota in Sixth Election District
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0509 (SB0529)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Southern Maryland Carousel Project
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519 (SB0528)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Lions Camp Merrick
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0611 (SB0526)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Lifestyles Homeless Services Center
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0914 /CH0243
Title
Charles County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0336
Title
Criminal Law - Coercion to Provide Sexually Explicit Images - Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0209 (SB0203/CH0279) Charles County - Board of Education - Salaries and Expenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0248 /CH0219 Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0300 /CH0095 Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0344 /CH0395 (SB0344) Charles County - Sunday Car Sales Blue Law Exemption - Enabling Authority By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Economic Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0419 /CH0402 Charles County - Off-Sale Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Population Quota in Sixth Election District By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0509 (SB0529) Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Southern Maryland Carousel Project By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0519 (SB0528) Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Lions Camp Merrick By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 3:00 PM
HB0611 (SB0526) Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Lifestyles Homeless Services Center By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 3:00 PM
HB0914 /CH0243 Charles County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0336 Criminal Law - Coercion to Provide Sexually Explicit Images - Penalties By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM