Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Charles County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0134 /CH0070
Title
Charles County - Property Tax Credit - New or Expanding Businesses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135 /CH0491
Title
Charles County - School Construction Excise Tax Rates
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Southern Maryland Carousel
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0137 /CH0492
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0199
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Unreimbursed Expenses of Foster Parents - Child Placement Agency
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0579
Title
Crimes - Extortion of Sexual Images
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589 /CH0097
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Certification for License Application
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0711
Title
Charles County - Eminent Domain - "Quick Take" Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0873 /CH0284
Title
Charles County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0915
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Charles County - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993 (SB0752)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0134 /CH0070 Charles County - Property Tax Credit - New or Expanding Businesses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0135 /CH0491 Charles County - School Construction Excise Tax Rates By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 491
Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0136 Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Southern Maryland Carousel By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0137 /CH0492 Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 492
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0199 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Unreimbursed Expenses of Foster Parents - Child Placement Agency By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0579 Crimes - Extortion of Sexual Images By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0589 /CH0097 Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Certification for License Application By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0711 Charles County - Eminent Domain - "Quick Take" Authority By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0873 /CH0284 Charles County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Appropriations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0915 Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Charles County - Warrant Intercept Program By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0993 (SB0752) Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM