Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Charles County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0198 /CH0115
Title
Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Cell Tower Batteries - Required Record
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0446 /CH0178 (SB0909/CH0177)
Title
Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457 /CH0134 (SB0347/CH0135)
Title
Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0649 /CH0085 (SB0569/CH0084)
Title
Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Priority Funding Areas
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0709 (SB0612)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Farming 4 Hunger Community Agricultural Facility
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0710 /CH0418
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness Certification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0712 /CH0138
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling to Underage Individual - Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Southern Maryland Carousel
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 /CH0419
Title
Charles County - Garbage Disposal Services - Provider Displacement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1320 /CH0735
Title
Southern Maryland Code Counties - Towing Companies - Authority to Regulate
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0198 /CH0115 Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Cell Tower Batteries - Required Record By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Economic Matters
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0446 /CH0178 (SB0909/CH0177) Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0457 /CH0134 (SB0347/CH0135) Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0649 /CH0085 (SB0569/CH0084) Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Priority Funding Areas By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0709 (SB0612) Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Farming 4 Hunger Community Agricultural Facility By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
HB0710 /CH0418 Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness Certification By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0712 /CH0138 Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling to Underage Individual - Penalties By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0720 Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Southern Maryland Carousel By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
HB1300 /CH0419 Charles County - Garbage Disposal Services - Provider Displacement By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1320 /CH0735 Southern Maryland Code Counties - Towing Companies - Authority to Regulate By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 735
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM