Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Charles County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0530
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Indian Head Center for the Arts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0536
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Indian Head Recreation Center
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0550 /CH0819
Title
Charles County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1723 /CH0625
Title
Charles County - Work Release - Collection of Inmate Earnings
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1737 (SB1266)
Title
Charles County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0530 Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Indian Head Center for the Arts By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB0536 Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Indian Head Recreation Center By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB0550 /CH0819 Charles County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 819
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1723 /CH0625 Charles County - Work Release - Collection of Inmate Earnings By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Judiciary
3/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1737 (SB1266) Charles County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM