Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Charles County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0347 /CH0135 (HB0457/CH0134)
Title
Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0569 /CH0084 (HB0649/CH0085)
Title
Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Priority Funding Areas
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0909 /CH0177 (HB0446/CH0178)
Title
Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0347 /CH0135 (HB0457/CH0134) Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0569 /CH0084 (HB0649/CH0085) Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Priority Funding Areas By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0909 /CH0177 (HB0446/CH0178) Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM