Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Charles County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0428 /CH0219 (HB0482/CH0218)
Title
Southern Maryland - Homeowners Association Commission - Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0429 /CH0190 (HB0384/CH0189)
Title
Charles County - Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items - Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0430 /CH0210 (HB0443/CH0209)
Title
Southern Maryland Code Counties - Collective Bargaining
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0431 /CH0174 (HB0345/CH0175)
Title
Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0432 (HB0335)
Title
Charles County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 /CH0192 (HB0387/CH0191)
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0428 /CH0219 (HB0482/CH0218) Southern Maryland - Homeowners Association Commission - Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 219
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2020 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0429 /CH0190 (HB0384/CH0189) Charles County - Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items - Penalties By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 190
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0430 /CH0210 (HB0443/CH0209) Southern Maryland Code Counties - Collective Bargaining By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 210
Finance
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0431 /CH0174 (HB0345/CH0175) Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 174
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0432 (HB0335) Charles County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0805 /CH0192 (HB0387/CH0191) Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 192
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2020 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:13 PM