Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Dorchester County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0079 (SB0305)
Title
Legal Advertisement or Legal Notice – Publication in Newspaper or Newspaper in General Circulation – Online Newspapers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0279 (SB0312)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0300 (SB0025)
Title
Commemorative Days - Maryland Voting Equity Reform Day
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1194 (SB0544)
Title
Charter and Code Home Rule Counties – County Property Leases – Notice Exemptions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0079 (SB0305) Legal Advertisement or Legal Notice – Publication in Newspaper or Newspaper in General Circulation – Online Newspapers By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0279 (SB0312) Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0300 (SB0025) Commemorative Days - Maryland Voting Equity Reform Day By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1194 (SB0544) Charter and Code Home Rule Counties – County Property Leases – Notice Exemptions By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/1/2021 9:29 AM
Click to return on the top page