Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dorchester County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066 /CH0433 (SB0002/CH0432)
Title
Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - Sundays
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0068 /CH0445 (SB0149/CH0444)
Title
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0069 /CH0007 (SB0006/CH0006)
Title
Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133 /CH0447 (SB0150/CH0446)
Title
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 /CH0433 (SB0002/CH0432) Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - Sundays By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0068 /CH0445 (SB0149/CH0444) Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0069 /CH0007 (SB0006/CH0006) Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Ways and Means
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0133 /CH0447 (SB0150/CH0446) Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM