Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dorchester County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0167 /CH0123 (SB0060/CH0122)
Title
Dorchester County - Class B Beer and Light Wine Licenses - Sunday Sales
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0180 /CH0126 (SB0076/CH0125)
Title
Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0285 (SB0152/CH0040)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 - Dorchester County - Cambridge Marine Terminal Redevelopment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0390 (SB0057/CH0121)
Title
Office of the State's Attorney - Dorchester County - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0167 /CH0123 (SB0060/CH0122) Dorchester County - Class B Beer and Light Wine Licenses - Sunday Sales By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0180 /CH0126 (SB0076/CH0125) Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0285 (SB0152/CH0040) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 - Dorchester County - Cambridge Marine Terminal Redevelopment By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0390 (SB0057/CH0121) Office of the State's Attorney - Dorchester County - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM