Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Economic Matters Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0347 /CH0613
Title
Professional Engineers - Firm Permits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348 /CH0098
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Employer Contributions - Application for Refund or Adjustment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0349 /CH0099
Title
Business Regulation - Cemeteries - Prohibited Acts and Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0350 /CH0100
Title
Business Regulation - Outdoor Musical Festival Promoter License - Repeal of Safety Permit Requirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0351 /CH0101
Title
State Athletic Commission - Amateur Mixed Martial Arts and Amateur Kick Boxing - Licensing and Regulation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352
Title
State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Civil Penalties - Citation Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0353 /CH0102
Title
Professional Engineers and Professional Land Surveyors - Licensing - Examinations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0354 /CH0103
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Monetary Penalty for Fraud
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 /CH0104
Title
State Board of Stationary Engineers - Qualifications for Stationary Engineer's Examination - Grade 1 and Grade 2
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 /CH0105
Title
Military Personnel and Veteran-Owned Small Business No-Interest Loan Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0392 /CH0111
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection Coverage - Prohibition on Premium Increase
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 /CH0115
Title
Insurance - Maryland Insurance Acquisitions Disclosure and Control Act - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0583 /CH0121
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Relief from Charges for Overpayment of Benefits - Restrictions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1330 /CH0676
Title
Workers' Compensation - Insurance Coverage - Employer Compliance
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1368
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Regulation of Mortgage Lenders, Mortgage Loan Originators, and Money Transmitters - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0296 (SB0305/CH0224)
Title
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0347 /CH0613 Professional Engineers - Firm Permits By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0348 /CH0098 Unemployment Insurance - Employer Contributions - Application for Refund or Adjustment By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Economic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0349 /CH0099 Business Regulation - Cemeteries - Prohibited Acts and Penalties By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0350 /CH0100 Business Regulation - Outdoor Musical Festival Promoter License - Repeal of Safety Permit Requirement By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0351 /CH0101 State Athletic Commission - Amateur Mixed Martial Arts and Amateur Kick Boxing - Licensing and Regulation By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0352 State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Civil Penalties - Citation Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0353 /CH0102 Professional Engineers and Professional Land Surveyors - Licensing - Examinations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0354 /CH0103 Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Monetary Penalty for Fraud By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Economic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0355 /CH0104 State Board of Stationary Engineers - Qualifications for Stationary Engineer's Examination - Grade 1 and Grade 2 By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0356 /CH0105 Military Personnel and Veteran-Owned Small Business No-Interest Loan Program By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Economic Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0392 /CH0111 Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection Coverage - Prohibition on Premium Increase By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Economic Matters
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0431 /CH0115 Insurance - Maryland Insurance Acquisitions Disclosure and Control Act - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Economic Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0583 /CH0121 Unemployment Insurance - Relief from Charges for Overpayment of Benefits - Restrictions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Economic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1330 /CH0676 Workers' Compensation - Insurance Coverage - Employer Compliance By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 676
Economic Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1368 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Regulation of Mortgage Lenders, Mortgage Loan Originators, and Money Transmitters - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0296 (SB0305/CH0224) Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM