Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Economic Matters Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1226 /CH0120
Title
Apprenticeship and Training - Replacement of Obsolete References
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1227 /CH0121
Title
Real Estate Appraisers - Licensing and Certification - Examination Waiver Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1244 /CH0123
Title
Education and Workforce Training Coordinating Council for Correctional Institutions - Name Change
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0312 (SB0077/CH0008)
Title
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1226 /CH0120 Apprenticeship and Training - Replacement of Obsolete References By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Economic Matters
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1227 /CH0121 Real Estate Appraisers - Licensing and Certification - Examination Waiver Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Economic Matters
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1244 /CH0123 Education and Workforce Training Coordinating Council for Correctional Institutions - Name Change By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Economic Matters
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0312 (SB0077/CH0008) Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM