Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Economic Matters Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0059 (SB0085/CH0338)
Title
Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Renaming and Reorganization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0060 /CH0084
Title
Insurance - Certificate of Qualification, Licensing, and Registration - Electronic Means
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0188 /CH0478
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Disclosure and Sharing of Information
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0059 (SB0085/CH0338) Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Renaming and Reorganization By Request - Departmental 5 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Economic Matters
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0060 /CH0084 Insurance - Certificate of Qualification, Licensing, and Registration - Electronic Means By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Economic Matters
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0188 /CH0478 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Disclosure and Sharing of Information By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM