Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Economic Matters Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187 /CH0479 (SB0006)
Title
Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – Expansion
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0188 /CH0045 (SB0077/CH0046)
Title
State Board of Architects and State Board for Professional Land Surveyors - Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0193 /CH0374 (SB0043/CH0373)
Title
High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0194 /CH0049
Title
State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Requirement to Register - Exemptions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0200 /CH0160 (SB0064/CH0159)
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0201 /CH0047 (SB0106/CH0048)
Title
State Board for Professional Engineers - Examination Requirements - Engineer-in-Training
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0518
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Reform on Tap Act of 2018
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0694 /CH0673
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Transfer of Administration to Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0848 /CH0480
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Reporting Agencies
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0187 /CH0479 (SB0006) Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – Expansion By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Economic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0188 /CH0045 (SB0077/CH0046) State Board of Architects and State Board for Professional Land Surveyors - Membership By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Economic Matters
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0193 /CH0374 (SB0043/CH0373) High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Economic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0194 /CH0049 State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Requirement to Register - Exemptions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Economic Matters
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0200 /CH0160 (SB0064/CH0159) State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Economic Matters
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0201 /CH0047 (SB0106/CH0048) State Board for Professional Engineers - Examination Requirements - Engineer-in-Training By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47
Economic Matters
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0518 Alcoholic Beverages - Reform on Tap Act of 2018 By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0694 /CH0673 Public Safety - Building Codes - Transfer of Administration to Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 673
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
HB0848 /CH0480 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Reporting Agencies By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM