Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Economic Matters Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0059 /CH0090
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Debt Settlement Services
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0060 /CH0091
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Renaming
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0061 /CH0092
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Mortgage Lenders, Loan Servicers, and Loan Originators
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 /CH0113
Title
Medical Professional Liability Insurance Policies - Mandated Deductible Levels - Limitation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0163
Title
Electricity - Combined Heat and Power Systems - Metering
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0164
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0165
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fees for Processing Articles of Dissolution, Certificates of Cancellation, and Other Documents - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0170 /CH0135
Title
Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program - Eligible Borrowers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0379 /CH0114
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Commercial Policies - Notice and Quotes
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0059 /CH0090 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Debt Settlement Services By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Economic Matters
1/30/2019 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0060 /CH0091 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Renaming By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Economic Matters
1/30/2019 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0061 /CH0092 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Mortgage Lenders, Loan Servicers, and Loan Originators By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Economic Matters
1/30/2019 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0162 /CH0113 Medical Professional Liability Insurance Policies - Mandated Deductible Levels - Limitation By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Economic Matters
1/31/2019 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0163 Electricity - Combined Heat and Power Systems - Metering By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0164 Business Occupations and Professions - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0165 Corporations and Associations - Fees for Processing Articles of Dissolution, Certificates of Cancellation, and Other Documents - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/30/2019 - 3:00 PM
HB0170 /CH0135 Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program - Eligible Borrowers By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Economic Matters
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0379 /CH0114 Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Commercial Policies - Notice and Quotes By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Economic Matters
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM