Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Education, Health, And Environmental Affairs Com, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0597
Title
Public Health - Immunizations - Related Institutions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0598
Title
Public Health - Vaccination Reporting Requirements - ImmuNet
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0599 /CH0183
Title
Public Health - Expedited Partner Therapy for Chlamydia and Gonorrhea
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0343 /CH0160
Title
Public Ethics - Advisory Bodies - Advisory Opinions and Informal Advice
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0597 Public Health - Immunizations - Related Institutions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0598 Public Health - Vaccination Reporting Requirements - ImmuNet By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0599 /CH0183 Public Health - Expedited Partner Therapy for Chlamydia and Gonorrhea By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0343 /CH0160 Public Ethics - Advisory Bodies - Advisory Opinions and Informal Advice By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM