Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Education, Health, And Environmental Affairs Com, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004 /CH0340
Title
Minority Business Enterprises - Program Participation - Requirements and Reauthorization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006 /CH0246 (HB0138/CH0247)
Title
Occupational and Professional Licensing Boards, Commissions, and Regulatory Entities - Notifications of Applicants, Licensees, Registrants, and Permit Holders
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0013
Title
Public Safety - State Militia
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0018 /CH0283
Title
Public Ethics - Bicounty Commissions - Financial Disclosure
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0028
Title
State Lottery Tickets - Prohibited Acts - Delivery Service
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0041 /CH0669
Title
State Board of Nursing - Nurse Licensure Compact - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0044 /CH0539
Title
Records Management and Preservation - State Units and Public Officials - Responsibilities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0548 /CH0824 (HB0824/CH0823)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0549 /CH0217 (HB1265/CH0218)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0004 /CH0340 Minority Business Enterprises - Program Participation - Requirements and Reauthorization By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0006 /CH0246 (HB0138/CH0247) Occupational and Professional Licensing Boards, Commissions, and Regulatory Entities - Notifications of Applicants, Licensees, Registrants, and Permit Holders By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0013 Public Safety - State Militia By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0018 /CH0283 Public Ethics - Bicounty Commissions - Financial Disclosure By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2017 - 2:15 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0028 State Lottery Tickets - Prohibited Acts - Delivery Service By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/12/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0041 /CH0669 State Board of Nursing - Nurse Licensure Compact - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 669
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2017 - 3:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0044 /CH0539 Records Management and Preservation - State Units and Public Officials - Responsibilities By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 539
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0548 /CH0824 (HB0824/CH0823) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 824
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0549 /CH0217 (HB1265/CH0218) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM