Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Education, Health, And Environmental Affairs Com, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006 /CH0493
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0009 /CH0496
Title
Agriculture - Maryland Egg Law - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0012 /CH0497
Title
Professional Engineers – Qualifications for Licensure – Experience Requirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0018 /CH0500
Title
Environment - Lead Poisoning Prevention Commission
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071 /CH0511
Title
State Board of Pilots - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0074 /CH0513
Title
Environment - Marine Contractors Licensing Board - Authority, Program Evaluation, and Termination
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0080 /CH0287
Title
Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0081 /CH0516
Title
State Government - Emergency Management - Continuity Planning
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0083 /CH0518
Title
State Government - Delivery of Notices and Communications by Electronic Means - Authorized
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0092 /CH0519
Title
Secretary of Agriculture - Weed Control Law
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0114 /CH0528
Title
Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Pilot Projects and Northern Snakeheads
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0530
Title
Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0118 /CH0532
Title
Land Use - Alcohol Production and Agricultural Alcohol Production
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0182 /CH0159 (HB0303/CH0158)
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0306 /CH0548 (HB0391)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners – Sunset Extension and Report
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0394 (HB0549/CH0249)
Title
State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0395 /CH0613 (HB0560/CH0612)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0006 /CH0493 State Real Estate Commission - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 493
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/09/2020 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0009 /CH0496 Agriculture - Maryland Egg Law - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 496
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2020 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0012 /CH0497 Professional Engineers – Qualifications for Licensure – Experience Requirement By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 497
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0018 /CH0500 Environment - Lead Poisoning Prevention Commission By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 500
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2020 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0071 /CH0511 State Board of Pilots - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 511
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/09/2020 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0074 /CH0513 Environment - Marine Contractors Licensing Board - Authority, Program Evaluation, and Termination By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 513
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2020 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0080 /CH0287 Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 287
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2020 - 3:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
SB0081 /CH0516 State Government - Emergency Management - Continuity Planning By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 516
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2020 - 3:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
SB0083 /CH0518 State Government - Delivery of Notices and Communications by Electronic Means - Authorized By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 518
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2020 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
SB0092 /CH0519 Secretary of Agriculture - Weed Control Law By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 519
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2020 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0114 /CH0528 Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Pilot Projects and Northern Snakeheads By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 528
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0116 /CH0530 Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 530
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/09/2020 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0118 /CH0532 Land Use - Alcohol Production and Agricultural Alcohol Production By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 532
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2020 - 2:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0182 /CH0159 (HB0303/CH0158) State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 159
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0306 /CH0548 (HB0391) State Board of Dental Examiners – Sunset Extension and Report By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 548
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0394 (HB0549/CH0249) State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0395 /CH0613 (HB0560/CH0612) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 613
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:27 PM