Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Environment And Transportation Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050 /CH0131
Title
Department of Agriculture - Maryland Produce Safety Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054
Title
Natural Resources - Lands Formed by Excavation Materials - Transfer of Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0105 /CH0141
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority Facilities - Video Tolls - Collection
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106 /CH0393
Title
Environmental Trust Fund - Surcharge Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0107 /CH0093
Title
Real Property - Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0180 /CH0142
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Licenses and Identification Cards - Electronic Credentials
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0376
Title
Vehicle Laws - Traffic Accident or Incident Management (Clear the Road Act of 2019)
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1353 /CH0132
Title
Agriculture - Nuisance Insects
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0050 /CH0131 Department of Agriculture - Maryland Produce Safety Program By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0054 Natural Resources - Lands Formed by Excavation Materials - Transfer of Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
HB0105 /CH0141 Maryland Transportation Authority Facilities - Video Tolls - Collection By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0106 /CH0393 Environmental Trust Fund - Surcharge Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Economic Matters
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0107 /CH0093 Real Property - Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2019 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0180 /CH0142 Motor Vehicle Administration - Licenses and Identification Cards - Electronic Credentials By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0376 Vehicle Laws - Traffic Accident or Incident Management (Clear the Road Act of 2019) By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB1353 /CH0132 Agriculture - Nuisance Insects By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM