Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Environment And Transportation Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Deployed Military Personnel - Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0149
Title
Real Property - Ground Leases - Required Notifications - Private Transaction Redemptions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0153
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0154
Title
Motor Vehicles – Electronic Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0157
Title
Vehicle Laws - Business or Occupational Licenses - Administrative Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0158
Title
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections - Standards and Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0159
Title
State Ethics Commission – Determination of Public Official in an Executive Unit – Information From Units of State Government
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0160
Title
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Eligible Organizations - Alteration of Geographic Boundaries
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161
Title
Nutrient Management – Nonagricultural Fertilizer Application – Requirements and Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162
Title
Transportation - Potomac River Bridges Towing Compact - Inclusion of Additional Bridges
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172
Title
Real Property - Ground Leases - Repeal of Registration Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0174
Title
Motor Vehicle Offenses - Following Too Closely - Application to Trucks
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0177
Title
Environment – Water Infrastructure Assets – Authorization of Emergency Actions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0549 (SB0394)
Title
State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0133 Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Deployed Military Personnel - Exemption By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0149 Real Property - Ground Leases - Required Notifications - Private Transaction Redemptions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0153 Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0154 Motor Vehicles – Electronic Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0157 Vehicle Laws - Business or Occupational Licenses - Administrative Penalties By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0158 Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections - Standards and Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0159 State Ethics Commission – Determination of Public Official in an Executive Unit – Information From Units of State Government By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0160 Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Eligible Organizations - Alteration of Geographic Boundaries By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0161 Nutrient Management – Nonagricultural Fertilizer Application – Requirements and Penalties By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0162 Transportation - Potomac River Bridges Towing Compact - Inclusion of Additional Bridges By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0172 Real Property - Ground Leases - Repeal of Registration Fees By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0173 Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0174 Motor Vehicle Offenses - Following Too Closely - Application to Trucks By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0177 Environment – Water Infrastructure Assets – Authorization of Emergency Actions By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0549 (SB0394) State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 4:14 PM