Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Environmental Matters Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0011 /CH0080
Title
Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0012 /CH0379
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses - Local Entities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0346 /CH0098
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Review of Capital Projects - Duties of Director
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0451 /CH0228
Title
Neighborhood Business Development Program - Financial Assistance for Food Deserts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0453 /CH0229
Title
Housing and Community Development - Multifamily Rental Housing Programs Efficiency Act
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0517
Title
Board of Public Works - State Wetlands Licenses - Best Interest of the State
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0553 /CH0410
Title
Housing - Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615 /CH0415
Title
Coast Smart Council
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0011 /CH0080 Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0012 /CH0379 Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses - Local Entities By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0346 /CH0098 Maryland Historical Trust - Review of Capital Projects - Duties of Director By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Environmental Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0451 /CH0228 Neighborhood Business Development Program - Financial Assistance for Food Deserts By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Environmental Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0453 /CH0229 Housing and Community Development - Multifamily Rental Housing Programs Efficiency Act By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Environmental Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0517 Board of Public Works - State Wetlands Licenses - Best Interest of the State By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0553 /CH0410 Housing - Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan Program By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0615 /CH0415 Coast Smart Council By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM