Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Environment And Transportation Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0061
Title
Environment - Solid Waste, Recycling, and Anaerobic Digestion
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0062 /CH0085
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0063 /CH0086
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing - Regulation and Use of Commercial Finfish Trotlines
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0065 /CH0087
Title
Tree Expert License - Application and Renewal - Repeal of Sunset Provision
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0229 /CH0256
Title
Commercial Motor Vehicles - Operation - Transportation Emergencies
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0325
Title
Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds - Nutrient Credit Purchases
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326 /CH0482
Title
Housing and Community Development - Business Lending and Neighborhood Revitalization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0503 /CH0268
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact - Board of Directors - Appointing Authority for Federal Members
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766 /CH0117
Title
Natural Resources - Fish and Fisheries
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797 /CH0631
Title
Nontidal Wetlands - Nontidal Wetland Mitigation Banking
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1506
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlife and Hunting
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0061 Environment - Solid Waste, Recycling, and Anaerobic Digestion By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0062 /CH0085 Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Licenses By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0063 /CH0086 Natural Resources - Fishing - Regulation and Use of Commercial Finfish Trotlines By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0065 /CH0087 Tree Expert License - Application and Renewal - Repeal of Sunset Provision By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0229 /CH0256 Commercial Motor Vehicles - Operation - Transportation Emergencies By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0325 Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds - Nutrient Credit Purchases By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0326 /CH0482 Housing and Community Development - Business Lending and Neighborhood Revitalization By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0503 /CH0268 Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact - Board of Directors - Appointing Authority for Federal Members By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0766 /CH0117 Natural Resources - Fish and Fisheries By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0797 /CH0631 Nontidal Wetlands - Nontidal Wetland Mitigation Banking By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1506 Natural Resources - Wildlife and Hunting By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM