Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Environment And Transportation Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0107
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Funding for Newly Constructed Single-Family Homes
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0119 /CH0003
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission - Establishment and Compact
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0120 /CH0101
Title
Department of Agriculture - Seafood and Aquaculture Product Marketing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0121 /CH0375
Title
Environment - Hazardous Material Security - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0122 /CH0670
Title
Motor Vehicles - Electronic Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0124 /CH0376
Title
Environment - Solid Waste and Recycling Facilities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0125 /CH0377
Title
Environment - Emergency Action Plans for Dams
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0126 /CH0102
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlife and Hunting
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0129
Title
BayStat Program and BayStat Subcabinet - Renaming
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0130 /CH0104
Title
Maryland Wine and Grape Promotion Fund
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0131
Title
State Planning - Central Depository
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133 /CH0378
Title
Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Notification of Elevated Blood Lead Level
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0134 /CH0105
Title
Homelessness and Supportive Services - Transfer to Department of Housing and Community Development
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0149 /CH0112
Title
Transportation - Light Rail and Metro Subway - State Safety Oversight Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0155 /CH0114
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Easement Termination
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0106 Department of Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
1/31/2017 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0107 Department of Housing and Community Development - Funding for Newly Constructed Single-Family Homes By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/31/2017 - 2:00 PM
HB0119 /CH0003 Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission - Establishment and Compact By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2017 - 1:15 PM
Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0120 /CH0101 Department of Agriculture - Seafood and Aquaculture Product Marketing By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0121 /CH0375 Environment - Hazardous Material Security - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 375
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0122 /CH0670 Motor Vehicles - Electronic Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2017 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0124 /CH0376 Environment - Solid Waste and Recycling Facilities By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0125 /CH0377 Environment - Emergency Action Plans for Dams By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 377
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0126 /CH0102 Natural Resources - Wildlife and Hunting By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0129 BayStat Program and BayStat Subcabinet - Renaming By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0130 /CH0104 Maryland Wine and Grape Promotion Fund By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0131 State Planning - Central Depository By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/31/2017 - 2:00 PM
HB0133 /CH0378 Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Notification of Elevated Blood Lead Level By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 378
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0134 /CH0105 Homelessness and Supportive Services - Transfer to Department of Housing and Community Development By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0149 /CH0112 Transportation - Light Rail and Metro Subway - State Safety Oversight Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2017 - 1:15 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0155 /CH0114 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Easement Termination By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM