Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Environment And Transportation Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633 /CH0423 (SB0578/CH0424)
Title
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records
Sponsorship Type
Co-Sponsor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0252 /CH0672
Title
Land Use - Agritourism
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0253 /CH0543
Title
Motor Vehicles - Automobile Transporters
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254
Title
Real Property - Ground Leases - Unlawful Collections
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255
Title
Secretary of State - Address Confidentiality Programs - Shielding of Real Property Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0279 /CH0104
Title
Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0694 /CH0673
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Transfer of Administration to Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0633 /CH0423 (SB0578/CH0424) Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records Co-Sponsor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0252 /CH0672 Land Use - Agritourism By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 672
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0253 /CH0543 Motor Vehicles - Automobile Transporters By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0254 Real Property - Ground Leases - Unlawful Collections By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0255 Secretary of State - Address Confidentiality Programs - Shielding of Real Property Records By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0279 /CH0104 Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0694 /CH0673 Public Safety - Building Codes - Transfer of Administration to Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 673
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM