Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Finance Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0013
Title
Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program Advisory Committee
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054 /CH0120
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Apprenticeship and Training Council
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0089 /CH0018
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Requirement for Certificate of Need - Exceptions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0096 /CH0023
Title
Health Insurance - Conformity With and Implementation of the Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097 /CH0024
Title
Insurance - Public Adjusters - Prohibited Inducements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0098 /CH0025
Title
Health Insurance - Medicare Marketing Rules
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0099 /CH0026
Title
Insurance - Fraud Violations - Civil and Criminal Actions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0100 /CH0027
Title
Insurance - Premiums and Charges - Review of Administrative Expenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0103 /CH0030
Title
Public Health Programs for Children - Renaming and Modernization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0104 /CH0275
Title
Health Officers and Baltimore City Commissioner of Health - Authority to Retain Collections and Waive Charges
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0105 /CH0031
Title
Health - Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Preparation and Filing Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0119 /CH0034
Title
Workers' Compensation - Subsequent Injury Fund - Billing Address Notification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0126 /CH0139 (HB0173)
Title
Public Safety - Prohibition of Polygraph Examinations by Employers - Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0130 /CH0038
Title
Commissioner of Labor and Industry and Workers' Compensation Commission - Reports of Accidental Injury or Disability - Electronic Sharing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0527 (HB0988/CH0434)
Title
Maryland Horse Racing Act - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0893 /CH0355 (HB0823)
Title
Health Insurance - Insurance Laws That Apply to Health Maintenance Organizations - Consolidation and Clarification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0013 Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program Advisory Committee By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
1/09/2014 - 1:30 PM
SB0054 /CH0120 Labor and Employment - Maryland Apprenticeship and Training Council By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0089 /CH0018 Maryland Health Care Commission - Requirement for Certificate of Need - Exceptions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 18
Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0096 /CH0023 Health Insurance - Conformity With and Implementation of the Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23
Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0097 /CH0024 Insurance - Public Adjusters - Prohibited Inducements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 24
Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0098 /CH0025 Health Insurance - Medicare Marketing Rules By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0099 /CH0026 Insurance - Fraud Violations - Civil and Criminal Actions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26
Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0100 /CH0027 Insurance - Premiums and Charges - Review of Administrative Expenses By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0103 /CH0030 Public Health Programs for Children - Renaming and Modernization By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0104 /CH0275 Health Officers and Baltimore City Commissioner of Health - Authority to Retain Collections and Waive Charges By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0105 /CH0031 Health - Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Preparation and Filing Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Finance
1/09/2014 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0119 /CH0034 Workers' Compensation - Subsequent Injury Fund - Billing Address Notification By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0126 /CH0139 (HB0173) Public Safety - Prohibition of Polygraph Examinations by Employers - Exemption By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0130 /CH0038 Commissioner of Labor and Industry and Workers' Compensation Commission - Reports of Accidental Injury or Disability - Electronic Sharing By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Finance
1/09/2014 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0527 (HB0988/CH0434) Maryland Horse Racing Act - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0893 /CH0355 (HB0823) Health Insurance - Insurance Laws That Apply to Health Maintenance Organizations - Consolidation and Clarification By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Finance
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM