Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Finance Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552
Title
Life Insurance - Payment of Death Benefits Under Group Policies
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0553 /CH0039
Title
Motor Clubs - Scope of Law - Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554 /CH0362
Title
Insurance - Reinsurers - Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0555 /CH0040
Title
Life Insurance - Cash Surrender Values - Supplemental Benefits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0556 /CH0363
Title
Health Insurance - Selection of State Benchmark Plan and Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0596 /CH0041
Title
Health Care Facilities - Surveys, Inspections, and External Reviews
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0608
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Notices, Policies, and Proof of Insurance - Electronic Format
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0757 /CH0381
Title
Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Required Disclosures
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 /CH0008 (HB0312)
Title
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0552 Life Insurance - Payment of Death Benefits Under Group Policies By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0553 /CH0039 Motor Clubs - Scope of Law - Fees By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0554 /CH0362 Insurance - Reinsurers - Fees By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0555 /CH0040 Life Insurance - Cash Surrender Values - Supplemental Benefits By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Finance
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0556 /CH0363 Health Insurance - Selection of State Benchmark Plan and Required Conformity With Federal Law By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0596 /CH0041 Health Care Facilities - Surveys, Inspections, and External Reviews By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0608 Property and Casualty Insurance - Notices, Policies, and Proof of Insurance - Electronic Format By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0757 /CH0381 Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Required Disclosures By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0077 /CH0008 (HB0312) Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Finance
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM