Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Finance Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0002 /CH0512
Title
Maryland Heritage Areas Authority - Revision of Boundaries and Boundary Maps
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0008 /CH0036
Title
Insurance - Risk Management and Own Risk and Solvency Assessment Act
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015 /CH0504
Title
Insurance - Charitable Gift Annuities - Special Permit Holders - Required Financial Statements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0017 /CH0249 (HB0141/CH0248)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Eligibility for Benefits - Business Operation Closings
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0019 /CH0037
Title
Insurance - Surplus Lines Insurers, Surplus Lines Brokers, and Reinsurers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0021 /CH0244 (HB0137/CH0245)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Collection by Assessment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0025 /CH0716
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Service - Contracted Taxicab Service
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0031 /CH0038
Title
Title Insurance - Rate Making - Use of Rating Organizations for Filings
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0032 /CH0039
Title
Insurance - Cancellation of Policy or Binder - Notice Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0033 (HB0142)
Title
Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0038 /CH0040
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Updating Advisory Boards and Councils
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0040 /CH0041
Title
Title Insurance Producers - Licensing of Business Entities and On-Site Reviews
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0047 /CH0207
Title
Reporting Abuse to the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program and the Office of Health Care Quality
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0048 /CH0042
Title
Health Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policies for Dual Eligible Individuals - Open Enrollment Period
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0002 /CH0512 Maryland Heritage Areas Authority - Revision of Boundaries and Boundary Maps By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Finance
1/17/2017 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0008 /CH0036 Insurance - Risk Management and Own Risk and Solvency Assessment Act By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36
Finance
1/18/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0015 /CH0504 Insurance - Charitable Gift Annuities - Special Permit Holders - Required Financial Statements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504
Finance
1/12/2017 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0017 /CH0249 (HB0141/CH0248) Unemployment Insurance - Eligibility for Benefits - Business Operation Closings By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Finance
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0019 /CH0037 Insurance - Surplus Lines Insurers, Surplus Lines Brokers, and Reinsurers By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Finance
1/12/2017 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0021 /CH0244 (HB0137/CH0245) Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Collection by Assessment By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Finance
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0025 /CH0716 Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Service - Contracted Taxicab Service By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 716
Finance
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0031 /CH0038 Title Insurance - Rate Making - Use of Rating Organizations for Filings By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Finance
1/12/2017 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0032 /CH0039 Insurance - Cancellation of Policy or Binder - Notice Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Finance
1/17/2017 - 11:00 AM
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0033 (HB0142) Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
1/17/2017 - 11:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0038 /CH0040 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Updating Advisory Boards and Councils By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Finance
1/19/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0040 /CH0041 Title Insurance Producers - Licensing of Business Entities and On-Site Reviews By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Finance
1/12/2017 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0047 /CH0207 Reporting Abuse to the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program and the Office of Health Care Quality By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Finance
1/19/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0048 /CH0042 Health Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policies for Dual Eligible Individuals - Open Enrollment Period By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Finance
1/12/2017 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM