Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Frederick County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0175 (SB0314)
Title
Frederick County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0256 /CH0610
Title
Frederick County - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Direct Judicial Review
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0276
Title
Frederick County - Deer Hunting - Use of Rifles
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0402 (SB0320)
Title
Frederick County - Authority to Ban Synthetic Cannabinoids
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0405
Title
Frederick County - Board of License Commissioners - Expanded Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 (SB0325)
Title
Environment - Frederick County - Soil Erosion and Sediment Control Standards
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0410 /CH0230 (SB0321/CH0229)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0414 /CH0228 (SB0315/CH0227)
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Permits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0429 (SB0319)
Title
Frederick County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for All-Terrain and Utility-Terrain Vehicles
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0432 (SB0316)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics - Former Officials and Employees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0434 (SB0317)
Title
Frederick County - Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0488
Title
Frederick County - Synthetic Cannabinoids - Prohibition
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1025 (SB0564)
Title
Frederick County - Forest Conservation Act - Application to Public School Property
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1387 /CH0591 (SB0957/CH0590)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Banquet Facility License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0175 (SB0314) Frederick County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit Organizations By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0256 /CH0610 Frederick County - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Direct Judicial Review By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 610
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0276 Frederick County - Deer Hunting - Use of Rifles By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0402 (SB0320) Frederick County - Authority to Ban Synthetic Cannabinoids By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0405 Frederick County - Board of License Commissioners - Expanded Membership By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0407 (SB0325) Environment - Frederick County - Soil Erosion and Sediment Control Standards By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0410 /CH0230 (SB0321/CH0229) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0414 /CH0228 (SB0315/CH0227) Frederick County - Gaming Permits By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Ways and Means
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB0429 (SB0319) Frederick County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for All-Terrain and Utility-Terrain Vehicles By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0432 (SB0316) Frederick County - Ethics - Former Officials and Employees By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0434 (SB0317) Frederick County - Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0488 Frederick County - Synthetic Cannabinoids - Prohibition By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1025 (SB0564) Frederick County - Forest Conservation Act - Application to Public School Property By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB1387 /CH0591 (SB0957/CH0590) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Banquet Facility License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 591
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM