Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Frederick County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0321 /CH0595 (SB0616)
Title
Frederick County - Property Tax - Exemption for Property Owned by Affordable Housing Land Trust
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0323 /CH0312 (SB0613/CH0311)
Title
Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax - Transient Charge
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0324 (SB0277)
Title
Frederick County - Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0329 /CH0097 (SB0615)
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Permits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0433 /CH0405 (SB0619)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 (SB0618/CH0313)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Country Inn Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0476 /CH0541 (SB0614/CH0540)
Title
Frederick County - Payment of Wages
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0485 (SB0617/CH0184)
Title
Frederick County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1112 /CH0357 (SB0897/CH0356)
Title
Frederick County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1205 /CH0645 (SB0993)
Title
Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of Maryland
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1362 (SB0010)
Title
Frederick County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1386 (SB1033)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Sampling or Tasting
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0321 /CH0595 (SB0616) Frederick County - Property Tax - Exemption for Property Owned by Affordable Housing Land Trust By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Ways and Means
2/06/2014 - 2:15 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 PM
HB0323 /CH0312 (SB0613/CH0311) Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax - Transient Charge By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Ways and Means
2/06/2014 - 2:15 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0324 (SB0277) Frederick County - Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0329 /CH0097 (SB0615) Frederick County - Gaming Permits By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0433 /CH0405 (SB0619) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0472 (SB0618/CH0313) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Country Inn Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0476 /CH0541 (SB0614/CH0540) Frederick County - Payment of Wages By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Economic Matters
2/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0485 (SB0617/CH0184) Frederick County - Sheriff - Salary By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1112 /CH0357 (SB0897/CH0356) Frederick County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1205 /CH0645 (SB0993) Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of Maryland By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1362 (SB0010) Frederick County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit Organizations By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1386 (SB1033) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Sampling or Tasting By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM