Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Frederick County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0320 /CH0481 (SB0884)
Title
Frederick County - Property Tax - Small Business Tax Credit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0601 (SB0466)
Title
Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0605 /CH0443 (SB0859/CH0442)
Title
Frederick County - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Administrative Appeals
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840 /CH0634 (SB0699)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Theater and Entertainment Center License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0841 /CH0126 (SB0693)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel Lobby License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0842 /CH0635 (SB0696)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Art Gallery Beer and Wine License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0843 /CH0127 (SB0695)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0844 /CH0128 (SB0694)
Title
Frederick County - Alcohol Awareness Program - Absence From Licensed Premises
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0859 (SB1029)
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate - Applicability to Public School Construction Projects in Frederick County
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1031 /CH0291 (SB0860)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1098 (SB1055)
Title
Frederick County - Public School Construction - State Funding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1109 /CH0133 (SB0861)
Title
Frederick County - Dry Election Districts - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1149 (SB0874)
Title
Frederick Center for Research and Education in Science and Technology - Funding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0320 /CH0481 (SB0884) Frederick County - Property Tax - Small Business Tax Credit By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481
Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0601 (SB0466) Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0605 /CH0443 (SB0859/CH0442) Frederick County - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Administrative Appeals By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0840 /CH0634 (SB0699) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Theater and Entertainment Center License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0841 /CH0126 (SB0693) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel Lobby License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0842 /CH0635 (SB0696) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Art Gallery Beer and Wine License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 635
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0843 /CH0127 (SB0695) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0844 /CH0128 (SB0694) Frederick County - Alcohol Awareness Program - Absence From Licensed Premises By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0859 (SB1029) Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate - Applicability to Public School Construction Projects in Frederick County By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1031 /CH0291 (SB0860) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permits By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1098 (SB1055) Frederick County - Public School Construction - State Funding By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1109 /CH0133 (SB0861) Frederick County - Dry Election Districts - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 133
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1149 (SB0874) Frederick Center for Research and Education in Science and Technology - Funding By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM