Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Garrett County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0318 /CH0222
Title
Garrett County - Salary Study Commission - Member Replacement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0343 (SB0383/CH0295)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - Boards of Education - Removal of Ex Officio Member
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0515 (SB0532)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - Christian Crossing Thrift Shop
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0541 (SB0474)
Title
Garrett County - Enterprise Zone Property Tax Credit - Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0690 /CH0418
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales for Off-Premises Consumption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0836 /CH0428
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A2 Light Wine Licenses - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0987 (SB0598)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - HART Animal Center
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097 /CH0445
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales for On-Premises Consumption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0318 /CH0222 Garrett County - Salary Study Commission - Member Replacement By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0343 (SB0383/CH0295) Allegany County and Garrett County - Boards of Education - Removal of Ex Officio Member By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0515 (SB0532) Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - Christian Crossing Thrift Shop By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0541 (SB0474) Garrett County - Enterprise Zone Property Tax Credit - Extension By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0690 /CH0418 Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales for Off-Premises Consumption By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0836 /CH0428 Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A2 Light Wine Licenses - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0987 (SB0598) Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - HART Animal Center By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB1097 /CH0445 Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales for On-Premises Consumption By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Economic Matters
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM